U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:19-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WEBB
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 13, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
  • May 06, 2020: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 17, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 13, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.