U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HAMBRICK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.