U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MONTOYA-GUZMAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order]
  • September 27, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 26, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 26, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.