U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MOORE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Order]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 18, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.