U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SMITH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 08, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.