U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:19-cr-00039-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MARRERO-VIENES et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Order]
  • October 15, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 10, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.