U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00051-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ARBAB
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 28, 2020: [Order to Surrender]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.