U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00065-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BERRY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Ex Parte Motion]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.