U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LOCKETT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order]
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 17, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.