U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MOORE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.