U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SAMS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 22, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.