U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:19-cr-00059-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SMITH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Order]
  • May 05, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 10, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.