U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TOLLEFSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Order]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 14, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.