U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HUBBARD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 03, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.