U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SMITH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Judgment]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Departure]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 03, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.