U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCGLAMORY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order]
  • December 18, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 18, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.