U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:19-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. RUIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 22, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.