U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. FLENTALL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Order]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Order]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 11, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.