U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:19-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JOHNSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 13, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.