U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. FLANIGAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Judgment of Acquittal]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Order of Detention]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 11, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.