U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BASS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order]
  • January 30, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 30, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.