U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SCOTT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 05, 2021: [Order]
  • February 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.