U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00076-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BALLARD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • November 15, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • November 09, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 29, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 28, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.