U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BAZA, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 13, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 14, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.