U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DAMMOND
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.