U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CRITTENDEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order to Answer]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order to Show Cause]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.