U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MAIZE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [COVID-19 Public Health and Safety Standing Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 19, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.