U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CARSWELL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
  • May 07, 2021: [Judgment]
  • May 06, 2021: [Judgment]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2021: [Judgment]
  • May 04, 2021: [Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Order of Dismissal]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 23, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 13, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 12, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.