U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BARTOLON-PEREZ
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.