U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. NATHAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.