U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. STEWART
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 19, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 05, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.