U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WILLIAMS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [COVID-19 Public Health and Safety Standing Order]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 24, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.