U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LAWLER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Speedy Trial]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 16, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.