U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00084-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GUDE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • October 26, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.