U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DIXON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 24, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 24, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.