U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. KUNZ
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 07, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.