U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:98-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.