U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:92-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kendrix
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • July 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.