U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GREEN et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 09, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.