U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MERDINGER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 23, 2020: [Order of Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.