U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PRESTON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Sentence Reduction - USSC Amendment - Amendment 821]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 28, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 28, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 04, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.