U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HUGHLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 29, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 24, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.