U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BARTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 07, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.