U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MANNINO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 09, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.