U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00019-4
  • Case Name: USA v. ALLEN et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • July 14, 2021: [Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Order]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 04, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order of Detention]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 09, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 09, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 09, 2020: [Order]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.