open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:20-68791-pwb
    Party Name:Matthew Jason Popovich
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:September 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order re: In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Order to Have the Filing Fee Waived]
    Date Published:September 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:August 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Autodocket of Installment Receipt - Intake]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Receipt of Installment Re: Voluntary Petition Filing Fee]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [03-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7 - Individual - No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Letter]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Application for Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee (103B)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1193360
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =