open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:20-41283-pwb
    Party Name:Brittany Cheatwood
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (batch)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:September 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Individual]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Employer Deduction Order]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Individual)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Employer Deduction Order]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [02-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 13) and Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [01 - Chapter 13 Plan - Initial Plan]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1193372
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =