U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MCCORMICK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Bifurcate]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Order]
  • September 24, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.