U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DEL CID, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order to Surrender]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 06, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • May 14, 2021: [Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • November 30, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 30, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 30, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 05, 2020: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • November 05, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 05, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 26, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 26, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 26, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 19, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 01, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Order]
  • September 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 21, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.