U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. FLOUNOY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 15, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.